GA HB205 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide a framework for regulating the offering or issuance of travel insurance in this state; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; framework for regulating the offering or issuance of travel insurance; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #285 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #25 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04 Effective Date
2021-05-04 Act 181
2021-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-02-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback