GA HB204 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide that property tax bills shall not include any nontax related fees or assessments; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; property tax bills shall not include nontax related fees or assessments; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House Vote #133 (Y: 111 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |