GA HB198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to eliminate certificate of need requirements for all health care facilities except certain long-term care facilities and services; to amend Code Section 50-18-70 of the O.C.G.A., relating to legislative intent and definitions relative to open records laws, so as to revise definitions; to amend Code Section 48-7-29.20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to tax credits for contributions to rural hospital organizations, so as to revise provisions relating to the rural hospital tax credit program; to amend other provisions in various titles of the O.C.G.A., for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; eliminate certificate of need requirements for all health care facilities except certain long-term care facilities and services
Sponsors
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] |
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #168 (Y: 99 N: 71 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #169 (Y: 72 N: 94 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #170 (Y: 129 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #169 (Y: 72 N: 94 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #170 (Y: 129 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Reconsidered |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |