GA HB197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Fair Business Practices Act, so as to provide for requirements for solicitations of services for obtaining a copy of an instrument conveying real estate; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Business Practices Act; requirements for solicitations of services for obtaining a copy of an instrument conveying real estate; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #178 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 67
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback