GA HB197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Fair Business Practices Act, so as to provide for requirements for solicitations of services for obtaining a copy of an instrument conveying real estate; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Fair Business Practices Act; requirements for solicitations of services for obtaining a copy of an instrument conveying real estate; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] |
Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #291 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #178 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #178 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 67 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hopper |