GA HB197 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Senate Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 9, Title 11, and Chapter 2 of Title 18 of the O.C.G.A., relating to verdict and judgment, the commercial code, and debtor and creditor relations; to repeal the "Georgia Foreign Money Judgments Recognition Act" and enact the "Uniform Foreign-Country Money Judgments Recognition Act"; to amend Titles 7, 10, 40, and 52 of the O.C.G.A., relating to banking and finance, commerce and trade, motor vehicles and traffic, and waters of the state, ports, and watercraft; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 and Code Section 17-14-17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to limitations on recovery for deficiencies connected with improvements to realty and resulting injuries and fraudulent transfers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Debtor-Creditor Uniform Law Modernization Act of 2015; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] |
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #458 (Y: 4 N: 159 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #94 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #94 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2015-04-02 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House Hopper |