GA HB196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to retirement and pensions, so as to require each public retirement system trustee to complete appropriate education applicable to his or her fiduciary duties and obligations under the public retirement system; to provide for definitions; to provide for removal of trustees who fail to obtain such education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; each public retirement system trustee to complete appropriate education applicable to his or her fiduciary duties; require
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #223 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #150 (Y: 152 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #150 (Y: 152 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 244 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |