GA HB196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide an exemption for royalties paid to musical artists; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; exemption for royalties paid to musical artists; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #388 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Vote #431 (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #265 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 56 N: 105 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #194 (Y: 126 N: 37 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #232 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #233 (Y: 97 N: 65 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-04-25 Act 25
2017-04-25HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 11th, 52nd, 36th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 171st, 106th, 130th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Insisted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Reconsidered
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/196
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164027.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166649.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167654.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167665.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169062.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170569.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170681.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15061
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15060
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15022
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15335
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15523

Bill Comments

feedback