GA HB192 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 12 of Article 2 of Chapter 1 of Title 7 and Article 8 of Chapter 2 of Title 14 of the O.C.G.A., relating to management of bank and trust companies and directors and officers of corporations, respectively, so as to change provisions relating to the responsibilities and standard of care of directors and officers of banks, trust companies, and corporations; to clarify and expand the ability of directors and officers to rely on other individuals in the performance of their duties; to shield directors and officers from liability for monetary damages to the corporation, its shareholders, and certain other parties in the absence of gross negligence; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banks, trust companies, and corporations; responsibilities and standard of care of directors and officers; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #239 (Y: 41 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #190 (Y: 128 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 248
2017-05-09HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback