GA HB189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to provide that any service contract such entities enter into shall contain a termination clause; to provide that poor performance or cost overrun shall constitute cause for termination of the contract; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract Cancellation Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #777 (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #219 (Y: 156 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2018-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback