GA HB183 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide for a right to appeal for any taxpayer that fails to file a property tax return or whose property tax return was deemed returned; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem tax; right to appeal for any taxpayer that fails to file a property tax return or whose property tax return was deemed returned; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #80 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Vote #53 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-05-06 Act 225
2019-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback