GA HB182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state sales and use tax, so as to lower the threshold amount for certain dealers; to eliminate an option for certain retailers to choose to either collect and remit sales and use taxes or provide certain notifications to certain purchasers and the state; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; lower threshold amount for certain dealers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #346 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #123 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28 Effective Date
2019-04-28 Act 63
2019-04-28HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-29SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-04HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback