GA HB182 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to juvenile court administration, so as to delete provisions relative to a rehearing on the order of an associate juvenile court judge; to provide for the appointment of a judge pro tempore; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile court administration; rehearing on the order of an associate court judge; delete provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
Rep. Delvis Dutton [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #352 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #435 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Vote #61 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #435 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Vote #61 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 28 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hopper |