GA HB181 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Senate Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal and reenact subsection (d) of Code Section 48-2-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to confidential information secured in the administration of taxes, so as to change certain provisions regarding the furnishing of certain tax information in all municipalities in this state having a population of 350,000 or more and make such provisions applicable state wide; to provide for additional procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for a criminal penalty; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; furnishing of certain tax information in all municipalities having a population of 350,000 or more; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] |
Rep. Paul Battles [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #209 (Y: 161 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-30 | House | House Hopper |