GA HB174 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-16 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-16 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to student health in elementary and secondary education, so as to require the Department of Education to provide to parents and guardians of students entering the sixth grade information regarding recommended adolescent vaccinations in print and electronic form; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education, Department of; provide parents and guardians of students entering sixth grade information regarding adolescent vaccinations in print and electronic form
Sponsors
Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] |
Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-22 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hopper |