GA HB173 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-20-87 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to eligible large retirement systems authorized to invest in certain alternative investments, so as to increase the percentage of an eligible large retirement system's assets that may be invested in alternative investments; to provide limitations for the Teachers' Retirement System of Georgia; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement and pensions; eligible large retirement system's assets that may be invested in alternative investments; increase percentage
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] |
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #272 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #190 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #190 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 271 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House Hopper |