GA HB17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding offenses against public health and morals, so as to provide for the offense of smoking inside any motor vehicle when a person who is under 13 years of age is present; to provide for a criminal penalty; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; smoking inside vehicle when a person under 13 is present; provide for offense
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] |
Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House Hopper |
2019-01-08 | House | House Prefiled |