GA HB169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that future elections for the office of probate judge of Charlton County, who also serves as chief magistrate of the Magistrate Court of Charlton County, shall be nonpartisan elections; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charlton County; probate judge; provide nonpartisan elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #48 (Y: 149 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 61
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback