GA HB169 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that future elections for the office of probate judge of Charlton County, who also serves as chief magistrate of the Magistrate Court of Charlton County, shall be nonpartisan elections; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Charlton County; probate judge; provide nonpartisan elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #112 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #48 (Y: 149 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #48 (Y: 149 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 61 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-30 | House | House Hopper |