GA HB165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical practice, so as to provide that maintenance of certification shall not be required as a condition of licensure to practice medicine, staff privileges, employment in certain facilities, reimbursement, or malpractice insurance coverage; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medical practice; maintenance of certification shall not be required; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Price [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #282 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #152 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #152 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 180 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hopper |