GA HB162 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the department and Commissioner of Insurance, so as to provide for insurance compliance self-evaluative privilege; to provide for intent; to provide for definitions; to provide for an insurance compliance self-evaluative audit document as privileged information; to provide for inadmissibility in certain legal actions; to provide for applications and exceptions; to provide for the burden of proof; to provide for related matters; to provide for an automatic repeal date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; provide for insurance compliance self-evaluative privilege; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #391 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #276 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #276 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 117 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House Postponed |
2015-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House Hopper |