GA HB1606 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Probate Court of Houston County; to identify the authorized uses of such technology fee; to provide for the termination of such technology fee and dedication of residual funds to technology uses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Houston County; Probate Court; authorize assessment and collection of technology fee
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] |
Rep. Danny Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Supplemental Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #819 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #806 (Y: 159 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #806 (Y: 159 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 700 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-28 | House | House Hopper |