GA HB160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mass transportation, so as to create the Georgia Commission on Transit Governance and Funding; to provide for the membership, powers, and duties of the commission; to provide for a report and proposal by the commission; to provide for assignment of the commission to the Department of Transportation for administrative purposes; to provide for cooperation of other government entities with the commission; to provide for other services to the commission; to provide for compensation and expenses; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mass transportation; create Georgia Commission on Transit Governance and Funding, provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #60 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2018-01-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2017-03-28SenateSenate Tabled
2017-03-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-16HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-16HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback