GA HB1598 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Guyton; to provide for severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal a specific Act incorporating the City of Guyton in the County of Effingham approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4230); to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guyton, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #744 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #779 (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #779 (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 697 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Hopper |