GA HB1594 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act governing the school system of the City of Savannah and Chatham County, approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2636), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4632), so as to modify the compensation of members of the Board of Public Education for the City of Savannah and the County of Chatham; to provide for applicability and an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Savannah, City of; Chatham County; Board of Education; modify compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #779 (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/63007 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/210123 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/63007#19610 |