GA HB158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to provide that Medicaid recipients have the same access to antiretroviral regimens used to treat HIV and AIDS as to those included in the formulary established for the Georgia AIDS Drug Assistance Program; to prohibit utilization management tools for such regimens; to provide for submission of a state plan waiver if necessary; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance; Medicaid recipients have the same access to antiretroviral regimens used to treat HIV and AIDS as to those included in the formulary established for the Georgia AIDS Drugs Assistance Programs; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback