GA HB1570 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to continue and re-create the State Court of Gwinnett County, approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 3331), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 19, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3718), so as to provide for an additional judge for the State Court of Gwinnett County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gwinnett County; State Court; provide for additional judge
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Gregg Kennard [D] | Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #744 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #771 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #771 (Y: 153 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-01-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 786 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hopper |