GA HB1568 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-04-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Walton County Public Facilities Authority; to provide for a short title; to provide for refunding bonds; to provide for bond validation; to provide for venue and jurisdiction; to provide for trust funds; to provide for the authority's purpose; to provide for charges; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for tort immunity; to provide statement of tax exemptions and exemptions from levy and sale; to provide for supplemental powers; to provide for effect on other governments; to provide for liberal construction; to provide for severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Walton County Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #718 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-04-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 682 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Hopper |