GA HB155 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, and computation of and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to create an income tax credit for certain expenditures by a production company related to certain state certified musical or theatrical productions or recorded musical performances; to provide for rules and regulations and an application process related to such income tax credit; to provide for certain conditions and limitations; to provide for definitions; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Musical Investment Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #422 (Y: 150 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #381 (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #259 (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #192 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #381 (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #259 (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #192 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 223 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hopper |