GA HB1541 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Effective Date 2022-05-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Effective Date 2022-05-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act changing the compensation of the clerk of the superior court, the sheriff, and the judge of the Probate Court of Cobb County from the fee system to the salary system, approved February 9, 1949 (Ga. L. 1949, p. 427), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 28, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3896), and by an Act approved May 2, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3617), so as to change the compensation of the sheriff, chief deputy, the assistant chief deputy, and the executive assistant to the sheriff; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Probate Court; change compensation of sheriff, chief deputy and others
Sponsors
Rep. Erick Allen [D] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] |
Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #831 (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #775 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Effective Date 2022-05-13 | |
2022-05-13 | Act 883 | |
2022-05-13 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hopper |