GA HB1537 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Cobb County, approved March 26, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 3211), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 3, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3787), so as to change the salary of the chief deputy clerk and the clerk of the State Court of Cobb County; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; State Court; chief deputy clerk and clerk; change salary
Sponsors
Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Mary Williams [D] |
Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #744 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar : House Vote #762 (Y: 152 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 733 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-08 | House | House Hopper |