GA HB1510 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act relating to the school system of the City of Savannah and Chatham County, approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2636), as amended, so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Savannah, City of; Chatham County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Edna Jackson [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Sen. Derek Mallow [D] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #691 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #653 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #653 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Effective Date 2023-01-01 | |
2022-03-23 | Act 585 | |
2022-03-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-23 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Hopper |