GA HB1500 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professions and businesses, so as to change certain provisions relating to certain boxing, wrestling, and martial art associations and federations; to revise a definition; to change the applicability of certain provisions as to matches, contests, or exhibitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; certain boxing, wrestling, and martial art associations and federations; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62544 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/208203 |