GA HB1466 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-05-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-05-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Magistrate Court of Dougherty County to impose and collect county law library fees as part of the court costs in the magistrate court; to provide for practices and procedures connected therewith; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dougherty County; Magistrate Court; impose and collect county law library fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #603 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #609 (Y: 147 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #609 (Y: 147 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-05-25 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 662 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House Hopper |