GA HB146 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 20 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding personnel administration, so as to provide for paid parental leave for eligible state employees and eligible local board of education employees; to provide for definitions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for terms and conditions; to provide for certain prohibitions; to provide for rules; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public officers and employees; paid parental leave for eligible state employees and eligible local board of education employees; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #326 (Y: 153 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #267 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #43 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #267 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Passage: House Vote #43 (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-05 | Act 225 | |
2021-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hopper |