GA HB1455 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-04-22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from City of St. Mary's ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in the amount of $25,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city who are 65 years of age or older; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide a specific repealer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary's, City of; ad valorem tax for municipal purposes; provide homestead exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-21 - House - Table: House Vote #749 (Y: 92 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #748 (Y: 94 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #672 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #679 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-22 Effective Date 2024-04-22
2024-04-22 Act 455
2024-04-22HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2024-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2024-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2024-03-28HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2024-03-28HouseHouse Taken from Table
2024-03-21HouseHouse Tabled
2024-03-21HouseHouse Reconsidered
2024-03-21HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2024-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-03-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2024-03-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-03-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2024-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2024-03-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback