GA HB1455 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia Ports Authority, so as to provide for powers of the authority; to expand the arrest authority of officers of the Georgia Ports Authority in certain circumstances; to provide for additional powers and duties of such officers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Ports Authority; provide for powers of authority
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Derek Mallow [D] |
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #633 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62375 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/207609 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/62375#19354 |