GA HB1451 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Brooklet; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for the exercise of powers and limitations on powers; to provide for a governing authority of such city and the powers, duties, authority, prohibitions, elections, terms, removal from office, method of filling vacancies, compensation, expenses, and qualifications; to provide for a city attorney, city clerk, and other personnel; to provide for bonds for officials; to provide for pending matters; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal specific Acts; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brooklet, City of; provide new charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-20 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #688 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #679 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06 Effective Date 2024-05-06
2024-05-06 Act 670
2024-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2024-04-01HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2024-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2024-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-03-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2024-03-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-03-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2024-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2024-03-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback