GA HB145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the state sales and use tax, so as to change the method of charging such tax on jet fuel; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; jet fuel; change method of charging tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback