GA HB1448 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the enforcement of laws regarding the operation of a motor vehicle with an expired, revoked, canceled, or suspended registration using recorded images to be penalized by a civil monetary penalty; to amend Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts; to amend Code Section 35-1-22, relating to prohibition on law enforcement retaining license plate data obtained from automated license plate recognition systems, limited use of data, and public disclosure prohibited, so as to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles and traffic; enforcement of laws regarding expired, revoked, canceled, or suspended registration by civil monetary penalty; provide
Sponsors
Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] |
Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Hopper |