GA HB1443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 13 of Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to food service establishments, so as to provide that mobile food service establishments that have active permits may operate in the county of origin and in one or more counties other than its county of origin without obtaining an additional permit; to provide for definitions; to provide for notice to other counties prior to operation; to provide for communication between the county of origin and other counties; to provide for inspections of mobile food service establishments by other counties; to provide for written notice of remedial measures upon failure of an inspection; to provide for violation fines and penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mobile food service establishments; operate in county of origin or other counties without an additional permit; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] |
Rep. Mike Cameron [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #769 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #689 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #689 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Effective Date 2023-01-01 | |
2022-05-05 | Act 825 | |
2022-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Hopper |