GA HB143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the O.C.G.A., relating to financial institutions; to amend Code Section 13-1-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the charging of convenience fees by a lender or merchant, so as to allow for such fees on loans made pursuant to Chapter 1 of Title 7; to amend Chapter 12 of Title 53 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to trusts, so as to revise a definition; to provide for the authority of a foreign entity to act in a fiduciary capacity; to prohibit the establishment of a place of business by a foreign entity acting as a fiduciary not transacting business in the state; to provide for a filing statement with the Secretary of State and appointment of an agent for service by a foreign entity; to provide for effective dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institutions; provide for definitions; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #199 (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #47 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 57
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-16SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback