GA HB142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to campus policemen, so as to provide for the establishment of unified campus police forces through agreements entered into by colleges and universities; to provide for definitions; to provide for arrest powers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; establishment of unified campus police forces through agreements by colleges and universities; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. Marvin Lim [D] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #380 (Y: 145 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #385 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #234 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #72 (Y: 157 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #385 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #234 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #72 (Y: 157 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 266 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 54th, 56th, 37th |
2023-03-27 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 56th, 71st, 12th |
2023-03-27 | House | House Insisted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-30 | House | House Hopper |