GA HB1413 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Effective Date 2024-05-06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide homestead exemptions from Putnam County school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in certain amounts of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that school district who are 70 years of age or older; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Putnam County; ad valorem tax; educational purposes; provide homestead exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-13 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #646 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #665 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06 Effective Date 2024-05-06
2024-05-06 Act 657
2024-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2024-04-01HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2024-03-13SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2024-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2024-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-02-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2024-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback