GA HB1411 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to revise, modernize, and consolidate the provisions of local law relating to the State Court of Putnam County (formerly the County Court of Putnam County), approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3839), as amended, so as to provide that on and after January 1, 2023, the district attorney of the judicial circuit within which Putnam County is located shall represent the state in all criminal prosecutions brought in the State Court of Putnam County and shall perform the duties of the office of solicitor-general of the state court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Putnam County; State Court; district attorney shall represent the state in all criminal prosecutions and perform the duties of solicitor-general; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #583 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #580 (Y: 155 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #580 (Y: 155 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 730 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House Hopper |