GA HB1406 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-66-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to hearings on proposed zoning decisions, notice of hearing, nongovernmental initiated actions, reconsideration of defeated actions, and procedure on zoning for property annexed into municipality, so as to provide additional notice and hearing provisions for changes to zoning ordinances that revise single-family residential classifications and definition so as to authorize multifamily residential property uses; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Zoning; changes to ordinances that revise single-family residential classifications; provide additional notice and hearing provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #634 (Y: 110 N: 51 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hopper |