GA HB1404 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to direct the Department of Community Health to submit a waiver request to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to authorize private institutions for mental disease to qualify for Medicaid reimbursement; to provide for implementation upon approval; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Health, Department of; submit waiver request to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services to authorize private institutions for mental disease to qualify for Medicaid reimbursement
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Pruitt [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #693 (Y: 167 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hopper |