GA HB14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prestige license plates and special license plates for certain persons and vehicles, so as to provide for the issuance of a special and distinctive license plate for veteran spouses in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; veteran spouses in certain instances; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |