GA HB14 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-16-21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fees for sheriff's services, so as to provide for the sheriff to collect and deposit certain fees; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; sheriff to collect and deposit certain fees; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #209 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Vote #25 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-20SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-13SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-02-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-09HouseHouse Hopper
2016-11-28HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback