GA HB1385 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 36 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to annexation of territory, so as to revise annexation reporting requirements to require the provision of reports to the Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Office of the General Assembly; to require the submission of a digital shapefile with such reports; to provide for regional commissions to assist certain municipalities in the production of such digital files; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Legislative and Congressional Reapportionment Office; revise annexation reporting requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Victor Anderson [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #796 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #641 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #641 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 778 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hopper |